judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAREN K. GOODEN V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0309
Short Caption:KAREN K. GOODEN V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB172-10Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/04/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerKaren K. Gooden NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECEIVED ONLY)
03/14/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/24/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS DENIED and petitioner shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, TENDER THIS COURT'S $100 FILING FEE and a complete copy of the March 11, 2011 Decision and Remand Order. Failure to comply shall subject this appeal to dismissal w/o further notice for lack of prosecution. See DC App. R. 13(a). It is ****MORE*****
03/24/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE WHY this PFR should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER since the case has been REMANDED and is pending below... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the LODGED PFR IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (BY: ETW)
05/11/2011 ORDERED that the LODGED PFR IS HEREBY STRICKEN and DISMISSED. (BY: ETW) LW
05/11/2011DISMISSED
05/17/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
05/24/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 15 DAYS TENDER THE $100 FILING FEE and a complete copy of the 3/11/11 Decision and Remand Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 15 DAYS FILE A RESPONSE to this 3/24/11 SHOW CUASE ORDER. Failure to comply with this order shall result in petitioner's motino for reconsideration being denied without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION is HELD IN ABEYANCE... (BY: ETW) LW
07/13/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
08/04/2011FiledMandate