judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RANDALL D. SCHREIBVOGEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0172)
Case Number:S-11-0172Case Docketed On:07/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:RANDALL D. SCHREIBVOGEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RANDALL D. SCHREIBVOGEL, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerRandall D. SchreibvogelW. Keith Goody
RespondentThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Meri Vania Geringer
Terry L. Armitage

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Post-Conviction Relief
Opinion Number:2012 WY 15
Citation:269 P.3d 1098

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/25/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/25/2011Petition - Writ - review (letter from Dr. William J. Brady not scanned as it contains unredacted information)PetitionWrit - reviewFinal
08/31/2011Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
09/09/2011Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
09/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Petitioner on Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2011Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
10/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Respondent; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/03/2011Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Meri Geringer for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2011Service - Mail returned - Case setting sent to Mr. Goody returned - forward time expired. Called and left message for Mr. Goody and forwarded to Cougar, Washington address.ServiceMail returnedFinal
11/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed (Sent Mr. Goody's copy of letter to the Cougar, WA address with a note to change his address with the bar.)Notice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - W. Keith Goody for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (W. Keith Goody for appellant; Meri Vania Geringer, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/07/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing for lack of jurisdiction, Justice Voigt writing for the Court, Chief Justice Kite filed a concurring opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/24/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal