judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

THOMAS ALTON MCCRARY v. CITY OF ODESSA

Case: B-2830
B-2830
06/29/1971
Application for Writ of Error
THOMAS ALTON MCCRARY
CITY OF ODESSA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/22/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/29/1972Post submission brief filedRespondent
03/22/1972Post submission brief filedPetitioner
10/21/1971Reply to ResponseRespondent
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/11/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/30/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/23/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/29/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/06/1972Response to Motion filed
06/22/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/07/1972Dissenting opinion issued.
06/07/1972Dissenting opinion issued.
06/07/1972Opinion issued
03/29/1972Post submission brief filed
03/22/1972Post submission brief filed
02/16/1972Document received (See Remarks)
10/21/1971Reply to Response
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingFiling granted
08/11/1971Response to Brief filed
07/30/1971Response to Motion filed
07/30/1971Response to Petition
07/23/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/22/1971Motion for leave to file brief
07/12/1971Order from Lower Court filed
07/12/1971Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
06/29/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/29/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CITY OF ODESSARespondent
Thomas Alton McCraryPetitioner
John H. HollowayAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information