judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHAW CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company v. ROCKY MOUNTAIN HARDWARE, INC., an Idaho Corporation

Case Heading (S-11-0171)
Case Number:S-11-0171Case Docketed On:07/22/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:SHAW CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company v. ROCKY MOUNTAIN HARDWARE, INC., an Idaho Corporation
Full Title:SHAW CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company, Appellant (Defendant), v. ROCKY MOUNTAIN HARDWARE, INC., an Idaho Corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShaw Construction, LLC, a Colorado limited liability companyPeter F. Moyer
AppelleeRocky Mountain Hardare, Inc., an Idaho corporationMark Diehl Sullivan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2012 WY 60
Citation:275 P.3d 1238 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/22/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/22/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/07/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/25/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/04/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Peter F. Moyer for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark Sullivan for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Peter F. Moyer for appellant; Mark Diehl Sullivan for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/18/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/03/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/07/2012Motion - Fees and costs Proposed OrderMotionFees and costsFinal
05/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Rocky Mountain Hardware's Motion for Award of Fees and Costs and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Affidavit of Mark D. Sullivan in support of Appellee's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs; Affidavit of Justin Kallal in Support of Appellee's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2012Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply to Motion for Appellate Attorney FeesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/22/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/22/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/25/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal