judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEELER (TIMOTHY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36469
Short Caption:KEELER (TIMOTHY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46433
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9800185CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/21/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12669
07/21/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 22, 2000 and July 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. Filed in district court on: July 19, 2000. 00-12670
08/01/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 22, 2000, and July 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. 00-13275
08/30/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-15287
08/30/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-15288
09/19/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: September 26, 2000. 00-16567
09/26/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17013
09/26/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-17014
10/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-19032
11/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19419
11/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 29, 2000. 00-19419