judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BASILE S. DASKALAKIS v. JACK VOSIKA; TETON RENTALS; BANK OF JACKSON HOLE; WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; MICHAEL MORRISSEY; WILLIAM B. RESOR; BARBARA HAUGH; LANCE JOHNSEN; ROBERT WRIGHTMAN; JOHN RESOR; SNAKE RIVER RANCH LLC; SNAKE RIVER ASSOCIATES LP; CRYSTAL SPRINGS RANCH, INC.

Case Heading (S-10-0031)
Case Number:S-10-0031Case Docketed On:02/05/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BASILE S. DASKALAKIS v. JACK VOSIKA; TETON RENTALS; BANK OF JACKSON HOLE; WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; MICHAEL MORRISSEY; WILLIAM B. RESOR; BARBARA HAUGH; LANCE JOHNSEN; ROBERT WRIGHTMAN; JOHN RESOR; SNAKE RIVER RANCH LLC; SNAKE RIVER ASSOCIATES LP; CRYSTAL SPRINGS RANCH, INC.
Full Title:BASILE S. DASKALAKIS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JACK VOSIKA; TETON RENTALS; BANK OF JACKSON HOLE; WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; MICHAEL MORRISSEY; WILLIAM B. RESOR; BARBARA HAUGH; LANCE JOHNSEN; ROBERT WRIGHTMAN; JOHN RESOR; SNAKE RIVER RANCH LLC; SNAKE RIVER ASSOCIATES LP; CRYSTAL SPRINGS RANCH, INC., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBasile S. Daskalakis Pro Se
AppelleeJack Vosika Pro Se
AppelleeTeton Rentals Pro Se
AppelleeBank of Jackson HolePaula Ann Fleck
AppelleeWells Fargo Bank, N.A.Jonathan James Wylie
AppelleeMicheal MorrisseyMolly Hartman Dearing
AppelleeWilliam B. ResorMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeBarbara HaugeMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeLance JohnsenMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeRobert WrightmanMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeJohn ResorMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeSnake River Ranch LLCMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeSnake River Associates LPMatthew E. Turner
AppelleeCrystal Springs Ranch, Inc.Matthew E. Turner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/05/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/16/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from appellant indicating that he thinks there are some parties missing from the caption. He will send a letter with more names - we will review caption upon receipt of letter.EventPhone CallFinal
02/17/2010Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
02/18/2010Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from appellant regarding parties he believed were left out of caption. After review of the pleadings available, it did not appear they should be parties to this appeal. Case is dismissed - no further action necessary regarding additional parties.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
03/05/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal