judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERESA D. WALKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0353
Short Caption:TERESA D. WALKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-21699-08Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTeresa D. Walker Y
James W. KleinNY
Christopher Kemmitt NN
Monica V. DouglasNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/06/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)))
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18 pgs/White) 10/19/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (451 pgs/Jeon) 10/20-21,25/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (31 pgs/McCarn) 10/25/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (19 pgs/tape) 3/4/11 proc. w/cd
06/09/2011RECORD INDEX
06/09/2011RECORD COPIES
06/09/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (government's ex parte motionf or issuance of a subpoena file medical records and for leave to file under seal filed 12/9/08) (sealed envelope)
06/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and appendix to 10/24/11.
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix by 90 days (Appellant)Granted
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief 1/23/12.
01/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension fo time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 4/23/12.
02/08/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (27 pgs/tape) 10/19/10 proc.
03/16/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal W/ waiver attached (Appellant)Granted
03/28/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal W/ waiver attached (Appellant)
03/28/2012FiledDismissed
04/19/2012FiledMandate