judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKSON VS. CITY OF N. LAS VEGAS C/W 30995

Case Information: 29305
Short Caption:JACKSON VS. CITY OF N. LAS VEGAS C/W 30995Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:29305*, 30995 Related Case(s): 38470 , 38833 , 39082 , 39385 , 40184 , 44230 , 44457 , 44876
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A357614Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/27/1996How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/1996Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
10/08/1996Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.
10/08/1996Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee.
10/22/1996Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/22/1996Order/IncomingReceived District Court Order. Certified copy of district court order: Order filed August 30, 1996, granting in forma pauperis status.
10/30/1996Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Certificate that No Transcript is to be requested, none made, none available.
11/14/1996BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
11/18/1996Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Statement of Evidence or Proceedings when no Report was Made or When Transcript is Unavailable. File Stamped Oct 18
11/18/1996Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Statement of Evidence or Proceedings when no Report was Made or When Transcript is Unavailable. File Stamped Oct 28 96
11/18/1996Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Statement of Evidence or Proceedings when no Report was Made or When Transcript is Unavailable.
11/25/1996Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Request of Leave of Court to Proceed in Proper Person.
12/06/1996MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Amended Request for Leave of Court to Proceed in Proper Person.
12/09/1996Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
12/27/1996Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2.
12/27/1996Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/10/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper person Designation of Record on Appeal.
01/21/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Appellant's Opening Brief.
01/23/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Addendum Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Appellant's Opening Brief.
01/27/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to File Appellant's Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages.
02/03/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to File Appellant's Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages.
02/03/1997BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Amended Appellant's Opening Brief with Leave of Court to Do So.
02/06/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Corrected Certificate of Mailing with Leave of Court to Do So.
01/20/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Strike Defendants CCSD, Board of Trustees Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals and /or Motion to Amend Appeal and Opening Brief (nos. 29305 and 30995).
01/26/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Strike Defendants' Joinders in Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals and /or Motion to Amend Appeal and Opening Brief (nos. 29305 and 30995).
01/30/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Strike Defendants Motions and Joinders in Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to Amend Appeal and Opening Brief (nos. 29305 and 30995).
01/30/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Proceed in Proper Person on Appeal/Supplemental Information Addendum (nos. 29305 and 30995).
02/11/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Objection to Reply to Motion to Strike Defendants CCSD, Board of Trustee Motion to Strike Petition/Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to Amend Appeal and Opening Brief. (Nos. 29305 and 30995).
07/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Filed Substitution of Attorneys. John S. Delikanakis in place substituting as attorney for North Las Vegas Housing Authority in place of Leland Eugene Backus. Nos. 29305, 30995.
10/10/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. (copy) from Clark County School District addressed to Jo Ann Jackson, informng her that Stephanie Barker no longer works in that office, and directing her to send all further correspondence to General Counsel, Clark County School District. Nos. 29305/30995. 00-17885
03/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Consolidating Appeals and Directing Responses. Although appellant Jo Ann Jackson was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, she has requested that both appeals be consolidated. Having reviewed the record in each appeal, we conclude that consolidation is warranted, and we hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve their respective response indicating why this court should affirm the district court's orders. fn13[No extensions of time to file the responses shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.] The responses must comply with Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure 28, 30, 31, and 32. Nos. 29305/30995. (01-05489) 01-05489
05/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Joint Ex Parte Motion for an Order Extending the time to Respond to Issues Raised in the Court's Order filed March 29, 2001. Nos. 29305/30995. (01-07334) 01-07334
05/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On May 2, 2001, respondents filed a "Joint Ex Parte Motion For an Order Extending the Time to Respond to Issues Raised in the Court's Order filed March 29, 2001." fn1[Respondents' joint motion having been deposited in the Supreme Court drop box on April 30, 2001, the motion was timely.] Respondents shall file and serve their response on or before May 21, 2001. Failure to fully comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel. We do not expect any further delays in the prosecution of this appeal. Nos. 29305/30995. (01-07545) 01-07545
05/22/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondents' Joint Response to Issues Raised in the Court's Order Filed March 29, 2001. Nos. 29305/30995 01-08550
05/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondents' Appendix, Vols 1 and 2. Nos. 29305/30995 01-08553
06/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand (Docket No. 29305); Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 30995). Pursuant to NRAP 3(b), these two appeals were consolidated. ' . . . we reverse in its entirety the September 10, 1996 order of dismissal in Docket No. 29305 and remand the case for further proceedings consistent with this order.' fn20[We conclude that the September 10, 1996 order is void with respect to Brian Cram and Howard Hollingsworth. Jackson's first amended complaint did not name either Cram or Hollingsworth as defendants.] fn22[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper persons documents received from appellant. Given our disposition of these consolidated appeals, we deny as moot the numerous additional requests for relief interspersed within the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 29305/30995. 01-09687
07/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10305
07/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 11, 2001. 01-10305