judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LIONEL L. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0354
Short Caption:LIONEL L. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2428-10Filed Date:03/11/2011

Opening Event Date:03/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLionel L. Young Y
Paul J. RileyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
James A. PetkunYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Paul Riley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Paul Riley, Esquire
04/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (125pgs/Tape) 2/15/11 proc. w/CD
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/27/2011RECORD INDEX
04/27/2011RECORD COPIES
06/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (unopposed)
06/27/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 5, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/22/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Ferren
02/29/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
03/22/2012FiledMandate