judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RITANO (JOSEPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36440
Short Caption:RITANO (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38472
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C164926Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12277
07/25/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney J. Daniel Hastings shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-12828
08/08/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/22/00 and 6/7/00. Court Reporters: Lisa Makowski and Mary Beth Cook. Filed in district court on: 8/4/00. 00-13718
08/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 22, 2000. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 00-15361
09/01/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15512
09/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for apellant shall file and serve the fast track statement within 20 days of this order. 00-16011
09/29/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-17197
09/29/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-17198
10/04/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17584
10/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." fn1[To the extent that appellant claims that his guilty plea was not knowingly and voluntarily entered, we note that such claims must be raised in the district court in the first instance by filing a motion to withdraw the guilty plea or commencing a post-conviction proceeding. We therefore express no opinion as to the merits of any such claims in appellant's fast track statement.]NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-18772
11/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19408
11/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 27, 2000. 00-19408