judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETER MITCHELL, ET AL V. PNC BANK, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0325
Short Caption:PETER MITCHELL, ET AL V. PNC BANK, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR5669-10Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/03/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJanet Williams N
Jon E. Shields NN
AppellantPeter Mitchell N
Jon E. Shields NN
AppelleePnc BankN
Daniel S. FioreNN
AppelleeIndustrial BankN
Vanessa Carpenter LourieNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/22/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 4, 2011, and it appearing that transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 daysfrom the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
04/08/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 12/15/10) (elp)
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (16-pgs/mccarn 12/15/10 proc.) w/cd
04/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/18/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/27/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (filed by PNC Bank, N.A.)dwm AND REQUEST FOR COSTS LW
04/28/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance (PNC)
06/27/2011 ORDERED that PNC BANK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED w/o prejudice to renewal because this court does not entertain a motion for summary affirmance from only one appellee in a case involving multiple appellees. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the REQUEST for costs IS DENIED... It is ***MORE****
06/27/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S BRIEF and joint appendix shall be filed w/n 40 days and the brief of appellees shall be filed w/n 30 days... (GLRDTE)
07/26/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (joint) (Appellee Industrial Bank, Appellee Pnc Bank)Granted
07/28/2011FiledTMC-JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
09/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
09/09/2011FiledAffirmed
10/03/2011FiledMandate