judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2813
B-2813
06/17/1971
Application for Writ of Error
W. SALE LEWIS, SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS AND MODERN SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION
SOUTHMORE SAVINGS ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/20/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/18/1971Post submission brief filedRespondent
11/08/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/16/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/06/1971Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/21/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/14/1972Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
05/05/1972Response to Motion filed
04/20/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/05/1972Opinion issued
11/18/1971Post submission brief filed
11/08/1971Reply to Response
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
08/16/1971Response to Petition
07/14/1971Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
07/06/1971Brief in Support of Petition
06/21/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/21/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/17/1971Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. Sale Lewis, Savings and Loan Commissioner of Texas and Modern Savings and Loan AssociationPetitioner
Southmore Savings AssociationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information