judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARNER VS. MORENO

Case Information: 36439
Short Caption:WARNER VS. MORENOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399585Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Buehler, BriceSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jeffrey R. Albregts Ltd.--check no. 8322.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12273
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-20573
11/22/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
12/07/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-21347
12/11/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-21575
12/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-22335
01/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Pendency of Bankruptcy Case and Automatic Stay. 01-01760
06/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Staying Appeal. On January 26, 2001, appellant filed a notice informing this court that he had filed a voluntary petition for relief under Title 11, United States Code. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. sec. 362(a)(1) this appeal is stayed. Appellant shall file a status report informing this court whether the bankruptcy proceeding is still pending and whether the automatic stay is still in effect within 60 days from the date of this order. Should the automatic stay be lifted such that this appeal may proceed, appellant shall provide this court with any order of the bankruptcy court lifting the stay or dismissing the bankruptcy proceedings. fn1[The notice was signed by attorney Lawrence D. Rouse, counsel for appellant's bankruptcy proceeding. In this appeal, appellant is represented by attorney Jeffrey R. Albregts. Attorney Albregts will be responsible for all future filings on appellant's behalf in this appeal.] 01-10924
08/01/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Notice of Entry of Order of Discharge in Bankruptcy. 01-13008
04/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 1, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a "Notice of Entry of Order of Discharge in Bankruptcy." Mr. Albregts shall inform this court in writing of the effect of that order on this appeal and attach any relevant orders entered by the bankruptcy court within 20 days from the date of this order. If the order has rendered this appeal moot, appellant shall file a motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal pursuant to NRAP 42 within the same time period. 02-06644
04/25/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Amended Notice of Entry of Order of Discharge of Bankruptcy. 02-07339
04/25/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-07340
05/29/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On April 15, 2002, this court entered an order directing appellant to inform this court what effect the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's order of discharge has on this appeal. On April 25, 2002, appellant filed a motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal pursuant to NRAP 42(b). Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion and order " . . . this appeal dismissed." SNP/CLK 02-09394
05/29/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.