judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAM J. MERSEREAU v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0194)
Case Number:S-11-0194Case Docketed On:08/26/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ADAM J. MERSEREAU v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ADAM J. MERSEREAU, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAdam MersereauTara Brooke Nethercott
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 125
Citation:286 P.3d 97

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/26/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
09/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance - Tara B. Nethercott for AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for continuance of date for appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/10/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina Olson.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
10/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Tina N. Olson and the Wyoming Public Defender's Office permitted to withdraw as counsel for the appellant.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
11/28/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/05/2011Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for appellant and requested signed hard copy of statement of costs e-filed November 28, 2011.EventPhone CallFinal
12/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Tara Brooke Nethercott obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/10/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volumes V-VI, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/05/2012Event - Phone Call to AG re oral argument, confirmed settingEventPhone CallFinal
03/15/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tara Brooke Nethercott and Gay V. Woodhouse, argument by Ms. Nethercott; Jeffrey Scott Pope for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/26/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Voigt writing for the court. Justice Burke files a concurring in part and dissenting in part opinion, in which Chief Justice Kite joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/12/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed by agent for warden at WSP 9/28/29012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/12/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/12/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/16/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 10/15/2012 by agent for warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/18/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal