judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KROTZ VS. MICROSOFT CORPORATION

Case Information: 36436
Short Caption:KROTZ VS. MICROSOFT CORPORATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A416361Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Buehler, BriceSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, Chtd.--check no. 19184.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12256
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-13431
09/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 19, 2000. 00-16771
11/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. The undersigned hereby stipulates to the substitution of Morris Pickering as counsel of record for respondent Microsoft Corporation in place of Schreck Morris, its current counsel of record. 00-20348
11/22/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Brice Buehler.
12/11/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 22, 2000. 00-21625
01/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Sullivan & Cromwell. 01-00173
01/16/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 24, 2001. 01-00900
03/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-04454
04/13/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation Extending Time to Enter Dismissal of Appeal. 01-06452
05/09/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The parties' stipulation filed on April 13, 2001 is approved. Appellants shall file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal on or before June 11, 2001. 01-07762
06/14/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. 01-09957
06/14/2001MotionFiled Motion. Joint Motion to Remand Appeal. 01-09959
07/24/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. The parties have moved to dismiss this appeal and to remand this matter to the district court for approval of a stipulated dismissal. The motion is accompanied by an order of the district court certifying that upon remand it will "sign and approve the stipulation and order for dismissal presented by the parties." We grant the parties' motion. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court pursuant to its certification, and we order this appeal dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-12508
07/24/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.