judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING ROY SCHATZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY,

Case Heading (S-11-0191)
Case Number:S-11-0191Case Docketed On:08/23/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING ROY SCHATZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY,
Full Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING ROY SCHATZ, Appellant (Objector), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoy Schatz Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Jay Arthur Jerde
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleeFarmers Canal CompanyMichael S. Messenger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/23/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2011Event - Other -Docket fee for this case received in S-11-0190EventOtherFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/30/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/30/2011Event - Hardcopy received - State's motion to dismiss appeal and memorandum in support; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2011Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
09/15/2011Motion - Reconsideration and Reverse Order Granting Order Dismissing AppealMotionReconsiderationFinal
10/04/2011Order - Denying Petition to Reinstate AppealOrderDenyFinal
10/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal