judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES P. WUNSCH v. KELLY M. PICKERING, f/k/a KELLY M. WUNSCH

Case Heading (S-07-0039)
Case Number:S-07-0039Case Docketed On:02/20/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JAMES P. WUNSCH v. KELLY M. PICKERING, f/k/a KELLY M. WUNSCH
Full Title:JAMES P. WUNSCH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KELLY M. PICKERING, f/k/a KELLY M. WUNSCH, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames P. WunschColin M. Simpson
AppelleeKelly M. PickeringLea Jacobs Kuvinka

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Marriage and Divorce
Opinion Number:2008 WY 131
Citation:195 P.3d 1032

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/20/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/09/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/17/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
05/30/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volumes III & IV, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting Lea Kuvincka on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Colin M. Simpson to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Colin Simpson for appellant; Lea Kuvinka for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/26/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/26/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/03/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/1/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal