judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEAN VS. MCANALLY

Case Information: 34636
Short Caption:DEAN VS. MCANALLYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9706118Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/12/1999 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Cliff J. Young counsel for appellant.
08/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07293
08/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/17/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Clifton J. Young-check no. 1756.
08/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 16, 1999. 99-07679
11/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-11930
11/30/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-11931
12/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 99-12359
12/09/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.