judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GIANT FOOD STORE V. BEVERLY A. CARTER

Case Information: 11-AA-0335
Short Caption:GIANT FOOD STORE V. BEVERLY A. CARTERClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES3094-10Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGiant Food StoreN
PetitionerBeverly A. Carter NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG, OAH, Michael Milwee & respondent
03/24/2011 On consideration of the PFR filed March 15, 2011, BY ERIC RIVES on behalf of GIANT FOOD STORE...it is ORDERED that GIANT FOOD STORE SHALL W/N 20 DAYS IDENTIFY ITS COUNSEL... It is *****MORE*****
03/24/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that GIANT FOOD STORE SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of standing since petitioner does not appear to be aggrieved by the Final Order which affirmed the determination that respondent is ineligible for unemployment benefits... (BY: ETW)
05/10/2011 ORDERED that this PFR is DISMISSED... SEE HARDCOPY (BY: ETW) LW
05/10/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED