Case Information: 14-CV-0550 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERT H. DESELMS V. GREGORY R. NUGENT, ET AL | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - General Civil (CAB) |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB6417-13 | Filed Date: | 05/13/2014 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 05/13/2014 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 07/02/2014 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/12/2015 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/11/2015 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/13/2015 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Robert H. Deselms | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Gregory R. Nugent | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Nugent Christoff PLLC | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Jaea Hahn | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
05/13/2014 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
05/28/2014 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
06/16/2014 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
06/19/2014 | Filed | Record Index | ||
07/02/2014 | Filed | Supplemental Record#1 (32-pgs/tape 4/18/14 proc) | ||
07/02/2014 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/11/2014 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
08/19/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
08/25/2014 | Filed | Received Order dated 7/11/14, mailed to appellant at 1833 Biltmore Street, NW, Apartment B, Washington, DC 20009 and returned by U.S.P.S. as "undeliverable" and notations (return to sender/appellant no longer lives at this address.) Appellant has provided the court with his most recent address as indicated on the motion he filed with this court on 8/19/14 . The court docket updated to note the new address. A copy of this order remailed to appellant and all parties at his most recent address to 14 Simpson Road Room 206 Fredericksburg, VA 22404(Appellant) | ||
09/11/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | ||
09/29/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
10/07/2014 | Filed | Opposition to appellant's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee Hahn) | ||
10/30/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | ||
11/10/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
11/21/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Hahn, Appellee Nugent, Appellee Nugent Christoff PLLC) | Granted | |
12/02/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant) | ||
12/02/2014 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
12/02/2014 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
12/02/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Hahn, Appellee Nugent, Appellee Nugent Christoff PLLC) | ||
01/12/2015 | Filed | Brief (Appellee Hahn) | ||
01/12/2015 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/12/2015 | Filed | Brief (Appellee Nugent, Appellee Nugent Christoff PLLC) | ||
01/12/2015 | Filed | Appendix (Appellee Nugent, Appellee Nugent Christoff PLLC) | ||
04/06/2015 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
05/04/2015 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
06/11/2015 | Filed | Submitted To Associate Judge Thompson, Associate Judge Easterly, and Senior Judge Belson.(Borislav Kushnir, Esq.)(Jack L. Wueker,Esq.) | ||
09/18/2015 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges; Belson, Senior Judge) | ||
10/13/2015 | Filed | Mandate |