judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRASER CONSTRUCTION VS. PONDEROSA WHOLESALE

Case Information: 36450
Short Caption:FRASER CONSTRUCTION VS. PONDEROSA WHOLESALECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9305080Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/31/2000 / Hicks, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark H. Gunderson, Ltd.--check no. 12182.
07/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12440
07/31/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Ponderosa Wholesale, Inc. hereby substitutes Carl F. Hylin in the place and stead of the Law Offices of M. Max Steinheimer. 00-17990
10/13/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Larry R. Hicks.
01/31/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 2, 2001. 01-02045
03/01/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-03804
03/01/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-03805
03/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 01-04536
03/14/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.