judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

(1) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2001-A LTD., (2) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2001-B LTD., (3) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2002-A LTD., (4) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2002-B LTD., (5) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2003-A LTD., (6) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2003-B LTD., (7) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2004-A LTD., (8) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2004-B LTD., (9) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-A LTD., (10) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-B LTD., (11) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-C LTD., (12) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2006-A LTD., (13) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2006-B LTD., (14) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2007-A LTD., (15) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2007-B LTD., (16) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2008-A LTD., (17) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2008-B LTD., v. S & T BANK,

Case Heading (S-11-0206)
Case Number:S-11-0206Case Docketed On:09/08/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:(1) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2001-A LTD., (2) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2001-B LTD., (3) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2002-A LTD., (4) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2002-B LTD., (5) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2003-A LTD., (6) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2003-B LTD., (7) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2004-A LTD., (8) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2004-B LTD., (9) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-A LTD., (10) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-B LTD., (11) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-C LTD., (12) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2006-A LTD., (13) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2006-B LTD., (14) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2007-A LTD., (15) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2007-B LTD., (16) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2008-A LTD., (17) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2008-B LTD., v. S & T BANK,
Full Title:(1) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2001-A LTD., (2) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2001-B LTD., (3) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2002-A LTD., (4) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2002-B LTD., (5) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2003-A LTD., (6) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2003-B LTD., (7) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2004-A LTD., (8) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2004-B LTD., (9) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-A LTD., (10) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-B LTD., (11) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2005-C LTD., (12) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2006-A LTD., (13) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2006-B LTD., (14) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2007-A LTD., (15) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2007-B LTD., (16) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2008-A LTD., (17) BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY PARTNERS 2008-B LTD., Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. S & T BANK, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBlack Diamond Energy PartnersGreg L. Goddard
Mark Alston Waller
AppelleeS & T BankStuart R. Day
Ryan Justin Schwartz
John Brian Joyce
Andrew Guy Dittoe

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction - Personal
Opinion Number:2012 WY 84
Citation:278 P.3d 738 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/08/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/08/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/24/2011Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
10/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Brief in ChiefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/08/2011Event - Phone Call - to counsel for appellee. Pro hac vice counsel has not been admitted in this court. They will submit motion for admission.EventPhone CallFinal
12/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's brief in chiefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court (Volume 2, pages 259-325 were inserted into the front of second volume)Notice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/30/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-V, Exhibits; Volume VI, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/04/2012Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Andrew Guy Dittoe & John Brian Joyce for AppelleeMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
01/05/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John B. Joyce and Andrew G. DittoeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2012Order - Pro hac vice - allowing John B. Joyce and Andrew G. Dittoe to appearOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/06/2012Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Mark Alston WallerMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
01/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. WallerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2012Order - Pro hac vice - allowing admission of Mark A. WallerOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting John Brian Joyce obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Greg Goddard obo Black DiamondNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from John B. Joyce obo S & T BankNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/14/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Greg Goddard and Mark Alston Waller; argument by Mr. Goddard for appellant; John Joyce and Stuart Day; argument for Mr. Joyce for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/14/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/15/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/03/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/03/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/5/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal