judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAMION FLUELLYN V. D.C. DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, (WORKER'S COMPENSATION)

Case Information: 11-AA-0334
Short Caption:DAMION FLUELLYN V. D.C. DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES, (WORKER'S COMPENSATION)Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Disability Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB198-10Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/04/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorWashington Metropolitan Area Transit AuthorityN
Mark H. DhoNY
Carol B. O'KeeffeNN
PetitionerDamion Fluellyn N
Richard W. Galiher, Jr.NN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services Office of DisabilityN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG, WMATA(Gen Cnsl)& Michael Milwee, Esq.
06/30/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
06/30/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (dlm)
08/16/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Petitioner)Vacated
09/01/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal pending decisions in 10-AA-689 and 10-AA-1025.
09/22/2011FiledMOTION - Intervene (WMATA) (Intervenor)Granted
10/03/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to Intervene
08/20/2012FiledProceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed
08/20/2012FiledBriefing Order
09/05/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)Granted
09/12/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)
09/12/2012FiledDismissed
10/04/2012FiledMandate