judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORALES VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36449
Short Caption:MORALES VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0001545Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Nevada General Insurance Co.--check no. 150847.
07/18/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-12377
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-20475
12/20/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer against Issuance of Writ of Mandamus. 00-22170
12/29/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave of Court for Petitioners to File Reply to Farmers Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-22719
01/12/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing. 01-00786
04/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Fn1[We grant petitioners' motion to file a reply to the answer. The clerk of this court shall file the reply provisionally received on December 29, 2000.] " . . . we grant this petition for a writ of mandamus, and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-06198
04/11/2001Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioner's Reply to Farmers Insurance's Answer Against Issuance of Writ of Mandamus. 00-22720
04/11/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Joseph J. Purdy for service upon Judge Steven P. Elliott. 01-06219
04/23/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Elliott by mail on April 20, 2001. 01-06219
05/08/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-06273
05/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.