judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID KENNETH MERCER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0204)
Case Number:S-11-0204Case Docketed On:09/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAVID KENNETH MERCER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID KENNETH MERCER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Kenneth MercerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Callan Riedel

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2012 WY 54
Citation:273 P.3d 1100

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/09/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
10/20/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
12/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Designation of Record on Appeal and Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young, Joshua Beau Taylor, and Callan E. Riedel to appear on behalf of Appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/09/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/28/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/11/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/30/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Card returned unsigned and undated. Called the District Court Clerk's office and verified that they did receive the record this date by verifying the certified bar code.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal