judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARVEY JOHNSON V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0333
Short Caption:HARVEY JOHNSON V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB173-10Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/08/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerHarvey Johnson N
Eric M. May NN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD,OAG and Michael Milwee, Esquire
04/25/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
04/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/14/2011RECEIVED - a Joint stipulation to dismiss (sent back--Chad Michael is not a party to case Petitioner's attorney was notified he will send a motion to dismiss instead and attach the stipulation to dismiss with it)
07/01/2011FiledStipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner Johnson, Respondent D.C. Dept. of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.)
07/15/2011FiledGranted-Stipulation To Dismiss Appeal
07/15/2011FiledDismissed
08/08/2011FiledMandate