judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOLIVER (GEORGE) VS. STATE C/W 35262/35760/36560

Case Information: 36441
Short Caption:TOLIVER (GEORGE) VS. STATE C/W 35262/35760/36560Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 35262 *, 35760 , 36441, 36560 Related Case(s): 35262 , 35490 , 35586 , 35760 , 35821 , 36560 , 36882
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145313Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/18/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12278
08/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36415, 36428, 36441, 36443, 36474, 36475. Document No. 00-13570.
12/18/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 00-22037
12/18/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 35262/ 35760/ 36441/36560. 02-03012
03/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-03233
03/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 20, 2002. 02-03233