judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAD FARON MEBANE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0196)
Case Number:S-11-0196Case Docketed On:08/26/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:CHAD FARON MEBANE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHAD FARON MEBANE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChad Faron MebaneDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 43
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/26/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/13/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/30/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Voigt.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
12/20/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/23/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/13/2012Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Dennis L. Sanderson is assigned to act in this matter for Justice Voigt who is recused.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
03/21/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. District Judge Sanderson writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/11/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal