judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE

Case Information: 11-CV-0326
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6565-10Filed Date:03/07/2011

Opening Event Date:03/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonNY
AppelleeFaternal Order of Metropolitan PoliceN
Paul A. FennNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed either for haivng been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER or for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
04/18/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to show cause order to 20 days. no oppo
04/21/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE to this court MARCH 28, 2011 OTSC shall be filed NO LATER THAN MAY 9, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
05/09/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEuntil June 20, 2011
05/11/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and appellant's response to the OTSC shall be filed NO LATER THAN JUNE 10, 2011. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED... (BY: ETW) LW
06/10/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEto Order to Show Cause (Appellant's) to 8/9/11 .
06/22/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN AUGUST 9, 2011 either file a response to this court's 3/28/11 OTSC or an appropriate motion. (CASTILLO) LW
08/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File- a response to Show Cause order pending settlement of litigation. (Appellant)Granted
08/18/2011FiledOrder Granting APPELLANT'S MOTION AND RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 11, 2011.
10/11/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Granted
10/17/2011FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL
10/17/2011FiledDismissed
11/08/2011FiledMandate