judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKSON VS. RAFAEL

Case Information: 36432
Short Caption:JACKSON VS. RAFAELCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35665 , 36083 , 36304 , 36609 , 40893 , 41500 , 41723 , 41820 , 42357 , 42358 , 42583 , 45039 , 45408 , 45711 , 46398 , 46465
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389572Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12247
08/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[On July 24, 2000, we received appellant's proper person withdrawal of her notice of appeal. In light of this order, no action will be taken on the withdrawal.] "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. This is the fourth defective notice of appeal filed by appellant within the last serveral months. Although we decline to impose sanctions upon appellant at this time, we caution appellant that sanctions may be imposed if appellant continues to file clearly defective notices of appeal.]. NNP99B-RR/CY/ML 00-13365
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13695
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-13695