judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY FINCH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0320
Short Caption:LARRY FINCH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL8241-02Filed Date:03/08/2011

Opening Event Date:03/08/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry Finch YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/08/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/24/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App R. 4 (b). (BY: ETW)
03/24/2011TMC - OTSC
05/05/2011 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. (THKNTE)
05/05/2011DISMISSED
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Served by: DCCA on 7/1/11).
07/12/2011FiledTMC - motion for reconsideration-MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE
07/26/2011FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
09/12/2011FiledORDERED THAT APPELLANT SHALL FILE COPY OF THE DOCUMENT THAT HE STATES HE FILED WTIH THIS COURT IN NOVEMBER 2010...AND HELD MOTION TO RECALL IN ABEYANCE
10/06/2011FiledAnswer/Response to court's Order dated 9/12/11. (Appellant)
10/13/2011FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE