judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

A. P. BOYETT, SR., ET AL. v. ROBERT S. CALVERT, D. A. (ANDY) ANDERSON, JAMES H. DOZIER, CECIL B. RYAN, ET AL., CITY OF COLLEGE STATION, D. A. (ANDY) ANDERSON, ET AL. AND CITY OF COLLEGE STATION

Case: B-2811
B-2811
06/18/1971
Application for Writ of Error
A. P. BOYETT, SR., ET AL.
ROBERT S. CALVERT, D. A. (ANDY) ANDERSON, JAMES H. DOZIER, CECIL B. RYAN, ET AL., CITY OF COLLEGE STATION, D. A. (ANDY) ANDERSON, ET AL. AND CITY OF COLLEGE STATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1972Notice of Appeal filedRespondent
02/07/1972Notice of Appeal filedRespondent
11/04/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/02/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/01/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/07/1972Notice of Appeal filed
02/07/1972Motion to Certify filed
02/07/1972Notice of Appeal filed
11/12/1971Response to Motion filed
11/04/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/02/1971Response to Petition
07/01/1971Response to Petition
06/18/1971Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/18/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/18/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D. A. (Andy) Anderson, James H. Dozier, Cecil B. Ryan, et al.Respondent
Robert S. CalvertRespondent
A. P. Boyett, Sr., et al.Petitioner
CITY OF COLLEGE STATIONRespondent
D. A. (Andy) Anderson, et al. and City of College StationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information