Case: 03-94-00378-CV
03-94-00378-CV
07/21/1994
Administrative law
Texas Coastal Bank, Pasadena, Texas and First Bank of Deer Park, Deer Park, Texas
Finance Commission of The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/30/2004 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
05/16/1997 | CASE STORED | | |||
05/24/1995 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||
05/16/1995 | Letter requesting pickup of exhibits | | |||
05/16/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/29/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
12/07/1994 | Submitted | | |||
12/07/1994 | Submission | | |||
11/04/1994 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||
10/24/1994 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||
10/20/1994 | Motion for oral argument disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/20/1994 | Motion to advance case dispose | Granted in part; dismissed in part | | ||
10/20/1994 | Submission | | |||
10/18/1994 | Brief filed | | |||
10/18/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/28/1994 | Brief filed | | |||
09/28/1994 | Motion for oral argument filed | | |||
09/22/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/15/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Dismissed | | ||
09/15/1994 | Motion to reconsider disposed | Overruled | | ||
09/08/1994 | Exhibits filed | | |||
09/08/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
09/06/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
09/02/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
09/02/1994 | Motion to reconsider filed | | |||
09/01/1994 | Motion to advance case filed | | |||
08/30/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Dismissed | | ||
08/30/1994 | Mot for Ext Transcript Disp | Dismissed | | ||
08/19/1994 | Transcript & SF Filed | | |||
07/28/1994 | Statement of Facts Received | | |||
07/27/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
07/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
07/21/1955 | Mot - Ext. to File Transcript | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/16/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
First Bank Of Deer Park, Deer | Appellant | Mr. B. Daryl Bristow Mr. Paul D. Warren |
Finance Commission Of The Stat | Appellee | The Honorable Dan Morales Ms. Barbara J. Szalay Mr. Jack Hohengarten |
Texas Coastal Bank, Pasadena, | Appellant | Mr. Paul D. Warren Mr. B. Daryl Bristow |
Texas Department Of Banking | Interested party | Mr. Everette D. Jobe |
State Banking Commissioner | Interested party | Mr. Everette D. Jobe |
Trial Court Information
250th District Court
Travis
Honorable Mary C Williams
93-10813