judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORAN VS. BONNEVILLE SQUARE

Case Information: 36433
Short Caption:MORAN VS. BONNEVILLE SQUARECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38381
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A355494Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/2000 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kirk T. Kennedy--check no. 6035.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12248
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/16/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: William C. Turner.
11/15/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-20046
11/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
11/21/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-20448
12/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Late Docketing Statement. 00-22272
12/29/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on December 21, 2000. 00-22696
12/29/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-22273
01/25/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 24, 2000. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. 01-01639
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form setting forth, among other things, the specific trial or hearing dates to be transcribed. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. 01-04390
03/19/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Copy of Request for Transcripts filed in district court on December 13, 2000. Transcripts requested: March 21, 22, 23 and 24, 2000. To Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. 01-04872
03/23/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 60 days requested. 01-05162
03/26/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Sharleen Nicholson re: non-payment for requested transcripts. "MISSING DOCUMENT." 01-05240
03/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to (1) file an amended docketing statement which full complies with NRAP 14, and (2) show cause why her appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. In addition, appellant's counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why the imposition of sanctions is not warranted under NRAP 14(c). The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts in this appeal is hereby suspended pending further order of this court. fn6[On March 23, 2001, appellant filed a motion for extension of time in which to file her opening brief. We deny the motion as moot.](Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-05471
05/02/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-07380
05/02/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Amended). 01-07381
06/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09923
06/27/2001Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Sanctions imposed on counsel for appellant." fn4[On June 13, 2001, we dismissed this appeal for lack of jurisdiction in an unpublished order.] We have previously sanctioned various attorneys in unpublished orders because they were careless in completing the docketing statement; we issue this opinion so that all state bar members are on notice that sanctions may result if the docketing statement is not fully and accurately completed, with all required documentation attached. As a sanction for his conduct, attorney Kirk T. Kennedy shall, within thirty days from the date of this opinion, personally pay to the Clark County Law Library the sum of five hundred dollars. In addition, Kennedy shall provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment no later than fifteen days after he remits payment to the Clark County Law Library. Before Young, Leavitt and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. 46. SNP01A 01-10798
06/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to court reporter Sharleen Nicholson regarding her letter to the court dated March 23, 2001.
07/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10412
07/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 18, 2001. 01-10412
08/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. ($500.00 to the Nevada Supreme Court Law Library). 01-13166