judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDON DEAN BLAKEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0188)
Case Number:S-11-0188Case Docketed On:08/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:BRANDON DEAN BLAKEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRANDON DEAN BLAKEMAN, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrandon Dean Blakeman Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/24/2011Motion - Appointment of counsel (No certificate of service)MotionAppointment of counselFinal
08/31/2011Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
08/31/2011Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Mr. Blakeman re: "Missing Pleadings." No response.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - received "Plaintiff's first set of requests for production of documents to defendant(s)."Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/06/2011Correspondence - Outgoing other. Sent letter to appellant advising that the documents he requested are in the district court, and were never transmitted to this court.CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal
09/16/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal