judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCO UNDERHILL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0321
Short Caption:MARCO UNDERHILL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4333-95Filed Date:03/07/2011

Opening Event Date:03/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarco Underhill YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/23/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 7 ,2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
04/06/2011RECORD INDEX
04/06/2011RECORD COPIES
04/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
05/13/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MO FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of thsi order. (By: ETW)
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (In pro se format).
07/06/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on June 8, 2011, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before June 13, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 day s from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (Castillo)
08/17/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
08/17/2011FiledDismissed
09/08/2011FiledMandate