Case Information: 11-FM-1090 | |||
Short Caption: | BERNARD FULTON, III V. E. SYDNEY FULTON | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence |
Lead: | 11-FM-0957 | Consolidated: | 11-FM-1090 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CPO1736-11 | Filed Date: | 08/23/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/23/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 11/03/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/23/2012 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Bernard B. Fulton, III | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | E. Sydney Fulton | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/23/2011 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
09/19/2011 | Filed | Initial Order - consolidating 11-FM-957 8 11-FM-1090 and directing record | ||
09/19/2011 | Filed | No Transcript Needed | ||
10/13/2011 | Filed | Motion To Stay Appeal (Appellant) | Denied | |
10/17/2011 | Filed | TMC/MOTION TO STAY APPEAL/LODGED OPPO | ||
10/20/2011 | Filed | Record Index 11-fm-1090 & 11fm957 | ||
11/01/2011 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte THAT THE UNTIMELY OPPOSITION SHALL BE FILED BY THE CLERK | ||
11/01/2011 | Filed | Opposition - to aplt's motion to stay pending appeal (Appellee) | ||
11/01/2011 | Filed | ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY | ||
11/03/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 (194-pg/tape 6/16/11 proc.) | ||
11/03/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record #2 (61-pg/tape 6/30/11 proc.) w/cd | ||
11/03/2011 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/10/2011 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
12/20/2011 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
12/20/2011 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
01/20/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
02/09/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) - 2/24/12 | ||
02/17/2012 | Filed | Stipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant Fulton, Appellee Fulton) | ||
02/28/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Stipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant Fulton, Appellee Fulton) | ||
02/28/2012 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
03/23/2012 | Filed | Mandate |