judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWN (MARK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36452
Short Caption:BROWN (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 25477Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12474
07/19/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on July 18, 2000 appointing Rick Lawton, Esq. as counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-12475
10/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement and a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-18284
10/30/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-19078
11/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, appellant has failed to comply with our order entered on October 16, 2000. Accordingly, we again direct appellant to file the required document with 10 days of the date of this order. We caution counsel for appellatn that failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel. 00-20091
11/29/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-20860
01/10/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to File Fast Track Statement Beyond Time. 01-00577
01/10/2001Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 01-00578
01/10/2001AppendixReceived Appendix. 01-00579
01/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. This court has determined that this appeal should be expedited and made subject to the fast track provisions of NRAP 3C. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on January 10, 2001. The State shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the fast track response. 01-01454
01/23/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-00578
01/23/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-00579
02/08/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: February 20, 2001. 01-02602
02/21/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-03252
03/23/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-05108
04/18/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-05201
04/18/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/04/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 19, 2001. 01-05201
03/27/2002MotionFiled Motion. 02-05405