judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ELKHORN CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. KM UPSTREAM, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Case Heading (S-11-0208)
Parent: S-11-0185 Case Docketed On:09/09/2011
Consolidated: S-11-0186 , S-11-0207 , S-11-0208
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:ELKHORN CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. KM UPSTREAM, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Full Title:ELKHORN CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KM UPSTREAM, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantElkhorn Construction, Inc., a Wyoming corporationMark W Harris
Scott David Cessar
Audrey K. Kwak
AppelleeKM Upstream, LLC, a Delaware limited liability companyRebecca H. Noecker
Drake D. Hill
Michael L. Beatty

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Liens
Opinion Number:2012 WY 79
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/09/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/09/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/13/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
09/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac ViceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow (Scott D. Cessar and Audrey K. Kwak)OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
09/19/2011Motion - Consolidate - S-11-0208 with S-11-0186MotionConsolidateFinal
09/21/2011Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Consolidate Appeals in Docket Nos. S-11-0186 and S-11-208.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Response to motion to consolidate appeal in docket nos. S-11-0186 and S-11-0208EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2011Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
10/11/2011Event - Phone Call - Left phone message for Drake Hill. Mr. Beatty is not admitted pro hac vice in these two consolidated cases.EventPhone CallFinal
10/12/2011Event - Phone Call - Left message on answering machine that attorney Michael L. Beatty needs to be admitted pro hac vice on these two consolidated cases.EventPhone CallFinal
10/20/2011Motion - Admission pro hac vice (Michael L. Beatty for Appellee)MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
10/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission of counsel pro hac vice; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/24/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Michael L. Beatty for AppelleeOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
10/26/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/12/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Defendant KM Upstream, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/30/2011Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Mr. Hill regarding our record request letter. He was notifying our office that motions are still pending before the trial court regarding missing portions of the record. If the motion is granted we can request the supplemental portions of the record.EventPhone CallFinal
01/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2012Event - Phone Call - Received call from Clerk of District Court. Judge still has portions of the record requested. Record may be a few days late.EventPhone CallFinal
01/10/2012Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order Denying Motion for an Order Including the Evidence Presented at the June 17, 2011 Hearing in the Record of This CaseRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/18/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two boxes, containing sixteen volumes. Volumes I-XV, Original Papers; Volume XVI, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/18/2012Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
01/19/2012Order - Denying Motion to Vacate Oral ArgumentOrderDenyFinal
01/19/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant KM Upstream, LLC's Motion to Vacate Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Scott David Cessar obo Elkhorn Const.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/31/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting for Rebecca H. Noecker obo KM UpstreamNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/02/2012Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
02/06/2012Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received Appellant KM Upstream, LLC's Motion for an Order Including the Evidence Presented at the June 17, 2011 Hearing in the Record of the Case and Notebook of ExhibitsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Elkhorn Construction, Inc.'s Opposition to KM Upstream, LLC's Motion for an Order Including the Notebook Handed out as June 17, 1011 Hearing into the Record of the CaseEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2012Order - Denying motion to include evidence in the recordOrderDenyFinal
02/15/2012Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before full court (Rebecca Noecker and Drake Hill, argument by Ms. Noecker; Mark Harris and Scott Cessar, argument by Mr. Cessar) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/06/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/21/2012Correspondence - Incoming from Newpoint Gas ServicesCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/22/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2). Record signed for 6/26/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal