judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KELVIN JOHNSON V. D.C. DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS

Case Information: 11-AA-0337
Short Caption:KELVIN JOHNSON V. D.C. DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Disability Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB068-09Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/17/2013Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/2014
Argued/Submitted:10/01/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/2015

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerKelvin Johnson N
Matthew J. PefferYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services Office of DisabilityN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE OF $100.00 PAID
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG & Michael Milwee
07/17/2013FiledRecord On Appeal
07/17/2013FiledRecord Completed
07/22/2013FiledBriefing Order
09/10/2013FiledOrder directing motion, brief & appendix
09/30/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
10/15/2013FiledMiscellaneous addendum to motion for leave to file petitioner's brief and appendix out of time (Petitioner)
10/18/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
10/18/2013FiledBrief (Petitioner)
10/18/2013FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
11/04/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
11/25/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 1/6/14
01/06/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
01/30/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 3/7/14
03/07/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
04/01/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 4/18/14
04/18/2014FiledBrief (Respondent)
04/18/2014FiledBriefing Completed
05/23/2014FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/28/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/01/2014FiledSubmitted to Associate Judge Glickman, Associate Judge Easterly, and Senior Judge Pryor
03/05/2015FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Pryor, Senior Judge)
04/07/2015FiledMandate