judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL'S CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK

Case Heading (S-11-0209)
Case Number:S-11-0209Case Docketed On:09/12/2011
Linked To: S-11-0210
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:MICHAEL'S CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK
Full Title:MICHAEL'S CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael's Construction, Inc., a Wyoming corporationJames L. Edwards
AppelleeAmerican National BankClint Andrew Langer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Liens, Other
Opinion Number:2012 WY 76
Citation:278 P.3d 701 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/12/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/20/2011Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel for appellant and advised secretary that the brief was rejected and needs to be e-filed with corrections.EventPhone CallFinal
10/20/2011Brief - Appellant (dated 10/17/11, resubmitted on 10/20/11)BriefAppellantFinal
10/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/05/2011Brief - Appellee and statement of costs.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - American National Bank's Response to Michael Construction's Brief on Appeal (Brief of Appellee)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts & Exhibits; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from James L. Edwards obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Clint A. Langer obo ANBNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2012Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/16/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before full court (James Edwards for appellant; Clint Langer for appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/18/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/18/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/21/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/20/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal