judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHURCH (ILONA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36453
Short Caption:CHURCH (ILONA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - 004300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/06/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12481
07/19/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/5/00 to 4/7/00 and 6/26/00. Court Reporter: Lee Bahr. Filed in district court on: July 14, 2000. 00-12483
08/02/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/14/00, 3/30/00, 4/5 and 4/6/00 (2 volumes). Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr. 00-13352
08/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15083
09/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 28, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. She requests an extension of 30 days. The motion is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement within 20 days of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 00-16722
10/11/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-17999
10/11/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-18000
10/25/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-18890
11/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[Should either party cite to portions of transcripts not previously filed in this court, the party shall file a transcript request form for the necessary transcripts, pursuant to NRAP 9(a).] The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-19880
12/26/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 25, 2001. 00-22389
01/25/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 01-01705
01/26/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion file January 25, 2001, is granted. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served on or before February 26, 2001. 01-01731
02/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-03574
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including March 28, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-04424
03/28/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/28/01. 01-05451
04/27/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/26/01. 01-07099
05/29/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/29/01. 01-08951
11/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-18536
11/06/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
03/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04192
04/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04352
04/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2002. 02-04352