judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2793
B-2793
06/11/1971
Application for Writ of Error
SHERIDAN C. LEWIS
RIVER OAKS CAPITAL CORPORATION, RIVER OAKS BANK AND TRUST AND JAMES E. LYON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/09/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/28/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/09/1971Response to Petition
06/28/1971Response to Petition
06/24/1971Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/11/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sheridan C. LewisPetitioner
River Oaks Bank and Trust and James E. LyonRespondent
River Oaks Capital CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information