judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANK J. JONES v. DAN ARTERY

Case Heading (S-11-0173)
Case Number:S-11-0173Case Docketed On:07/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Cities and Towns (Title 15)
Short Title:FRANK J. JONES v. DAN ARTERY
Full Title:FRANK J. JONES, Appellant (Defendant), v. DAN ARTERY, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrank J. JonesFrank J. Jones
AppelleeDan ArteryRichard Alan Mincer
Melissa Rae Theriault

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Costs
Opinion Number:2012 WY 63
Citation:275 P.3d 1244

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/25/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/22/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of supplemental designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/22/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/06/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/01/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/17/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/17/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/22/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/21/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal