judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALBERTA COTMAN V. MARVELOUS MARKET, LLC

Case Information: 11-AA-0311
Short Caption:ALBERTA COTMAN V. MARVELOUS MARKET, LLCClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES3044-10Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAlberta Cotman YPro SeN
RespondentMarvelous Market LLCN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/14/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/23/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 14, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/27/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 23, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/09/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
08/09/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
10/17/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte - schedule before merits division
10/17/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/06/2012FiledSubmitted To Oberly,Easterly,King
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) Oberly and Easterly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
05/18/2012FiledMandate