judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALFRED LEE BALDES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0168)
Case Number:S-11-0168Case Docketed On:07/15/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ALFRED LEE BALDES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ALFRED LEE BALDES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlfred Lee BaldesKatherine Ann Strike
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Gregory Asay

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 67
Citation:276 P.3d 386

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/15/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/15/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/01/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/17/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
10/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young, Joshua Beau Taylor and Gregory Asay and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Katherine A. Strike for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gregory Asay, Student Intern, on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Katherine Ann Strike for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Gregory Asay, Student Intern, PAP, argument by Mr. Asay for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/15/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/31/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/31/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/31/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/05/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/4/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal