judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EVOLVE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT V. CHANEL ROWE-GREEN

Case Information: 11-AA-0308
Short Caption:EVOLVE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT V. CHANEL ROWE-GREENClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES34-11Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerEvolve Property ManagementN
RespondentChanel Rowe-Green NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/14/2011FILING FEE OF $100.00 PAID
03/14/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD (DOES), OAH & Respondent
03/18/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Evolve Property Management is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
04/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 18, 2011, directing petitioner to submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that petitioner has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this petition for review is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
04/14/2011DISMISSED
05/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED