judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRYL M. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0344
Short Caption:DARRYL M. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2235-10Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/17/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarryl M. Johnson Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Shane N. WallerYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/24/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
04/14/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/18/2011RECEIVED- amended statement regarding transcripts
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (154pgs/Ronan) 2/4/11 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (187pgs/Pirfo) 2/7-8/11 proc. w/CD
05/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/01/2011RECORD INDEX
06/01/2011RECORD COPIES
07/15/2011FiledOrder directing the brief and limited appendix of appellant.
08/12/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to file brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Titled as: Motion for Ext of time to file Statement Regarding Transcript) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/31/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until October 3, 2011
10/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 11, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
10/31/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until November 11, 2011
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until November 29, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
11/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until December 13, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
12/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until December 27, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
12/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 27, 2011
12/28/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/30/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
01/11/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motions For Leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix and directing the appellee's brief to be filed within 30 days from the date of this order
01/11/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/11/2012FiledBrief (no appdx attached) (Appellant)
02/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/01/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
03/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/17/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Easterly,Schwelb
05/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
06/13/2012FiledMandate