judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING PHILLIP HARTMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY

Case Heading (S-11-0190)
Case Number:S-11-0190Case Docketed On:08/23/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING PHILLIP HARTMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY
Full Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING PHILLIP HARTMAN, Appellant (Objector), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPhillip H. Hartman Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Jay Arthur Jerde
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleeFarmers Canal CompanyMichael S. Messenger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/23/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2011Fees - Docket fee received (Check for payment of this case and Docket No. S-11-0191)FeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/30/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/30/2011Event - Hardcopy received - State's motion to dismiss appeal and memorandum in support; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2011Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
09/16/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/19/2011Event - Rejected Filing - motion to reconsider and reverse order granting order dismissing appeal. Untimely.EventRejected FilingFinal
09/19/2011Correspondence - Outgoing - returned motion to appellant with letter indicating untimeliness.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
09/30/2011Event - Other. Received "Hartman's Motion to Mandate the Act of Filing A served Petition on the Date of Receipt of Such."EventOtherFinal
10/04/2011Correspondence - Outgoing. At Court's request, sent letter to appellant regarding motions. No further filings will be accepted.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal