judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCCLURE VS. STATE, UNIVERSITY AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM OF NEVADA

Case Information: 36435
Short Caption:MCCLURE VS. STATE, UNIVERSITY AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM OF NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A411347Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ShearingCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Buehler, BriceSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/15/2002 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/15/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Gordon & Silver-check no. 15006.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12253
07/17/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver.
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-20576
11/22/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
12/07/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-21346
12/07/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-21365
12/14/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-21863
04/09/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 04/06/01. 01-06090
04/09/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-06091
05/03/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 05/03/01. 01-07424
06/04/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 06/01/01. 01-09212
06/04/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
06/04/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Consent to Filing of Brief by Amicus Curiae Nevada Faculty Alliance. 01-09283
06/04/2001BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae, the Nevada Faculty Alliance. 01-09296
06/04/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Amicus Curiae The Nevada Faculty Alliance. 01-09299
12/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 15, 2002, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP02-CY/DA/ML)
01/02/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/03/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent Brooke A. Nielsen, Assistant General Counsel. 02-00147
01/15/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML.
03/29/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order granting the University's motion for judgment on the pleadings." SNP02CY/DA/ML 02-05586
04/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05750
04/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2002. 02-05750
04/30/2002MotionFiled Motion. 02-07602
05/13/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Reply to Moton for Publication. 02-08382
05/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On March 29, 2002, this court entered an Order of Affirmance in this appeal. On April 30, 2002, respondent filed a motion for publication of that order as an opinion. After considering the motion, we conclude that publication is not warranted. We deny the motion. 02-08510